U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00594
  • Case Name: Callier v. Pottawatomie County Public Safety Center Trust et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: [Exhibit]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Refer Case to ADR]
  • April 04, 2025: [Refer Case to ADR]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Witness List - Expert]
  • October 04, 2024: [Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.