U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01029
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.