U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00783
  • Case Name: First Baptist Church v. Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 21, 2025: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • April 21, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 21, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 07, 2025: [Witness List]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 04, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.