U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-01006
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Fisher et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Special Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Issued]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 20, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Issued]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.