U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01009
  • Case Name: Skrdla v. Harding
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Submission of Habeas State Court Record]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Non - Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: [Writ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.