U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00410-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez, Jr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • March 27, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • March 27, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2024
  • November 03, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Docket]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [DPPA-Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 04, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2024: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.