U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00368-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 25, 2025: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • April 11, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 11, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing]
January, 2025
  • January 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Docket]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.