U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00278-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Lin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • May 07, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 06, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 01, 2025: [Transcript Letter]
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appeal Transcript]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 18, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 18, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • March 13, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 13, 2025: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 13, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2024
  • December 17, 2024: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • December 05, 2024: [Hearing]
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Seal Document]
  • October 11, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 10, 2024: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 09, 2024: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order for Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.