U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00444
  • Case Name: Whitmarsh v. FedEx Corporate Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 09, 2024: [Protective Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.