U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyd et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • May 07, 2025: [Seal Document]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Docket]
  • October 04, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.