U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-01060
  • Case Name: Bonilla et al v. Gerlach et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Docket]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Exclude]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 17, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 17, 2025: [Witness List]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Quash]
  • October 10, 2024: [Leave]
  • October 03, 2024: [Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.