U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Simmons v. Edmond City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript Letter]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certify]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript Letter]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 10, 2025: [USCA Appeal Fee]
  • April 10, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Bifurcate]
  • April 04, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Joint Status Report]
  • March 31, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 31, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2025: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Witness List]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 08, 2024: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 04, 2024: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • October 03, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.