U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00276-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tewanema
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.