U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phu et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Joint Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Transcript Letter]
  • March 19, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • March 19, 2025: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • October 11, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 10, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 09, 2024: [Joinder]
  • October 08, 2024: [Joinder]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • October 08, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 07, 2024: [Supplement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Brief in Support]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.