U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00674
  • Case Name: SMP Stones LLC v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2024: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.