U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00864
  • Case Name: Wright v. OGE Energy Corp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 09, 2024: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 09, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 09, 2024: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.