U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00755
  • Case Name: Phelps v. Holliman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA - Mandate Issued]
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Order]
February, 2025
  • February 02, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Exhibit]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.