U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01039
  • Case Name: Arciniega et al v. City of Lawton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order for Response]
  • October 04, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.