U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00873
  • Case Name: Jones v. Oklahoma State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 25, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 01, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 04, 2024: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.