U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00303-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stapp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order for Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order for Response]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 06, 2024: [Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.