U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00682
  • Case Name: Parsley et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 06, 2024: [Leave]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.