U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Support]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 19, 2024: [Jury Verdict ]
  • December 08, 2024: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 06, 2024: [Objections]
November, 2024
  • November 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.