U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00101
  • Case Name: ProDigital Labs LLC v. Straight Smile LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Surreply]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 12, 2025: [Leave]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.