U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00156-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Kerr et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
February, 2025
  • February 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2024: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • October 07, 2024: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 07, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2024: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • October 07, 2024: [Waive and File Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 07, 2024: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.