U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00194-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mathews
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Variance]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 25, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 11, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 07, 2024: [Docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.