U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00376-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benford et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2024
  • December 01, 2024: [Seal Document]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Docket]
  • October 08, 2024: [Joint Discovery Statement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2024: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.