U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00433-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: [Appeal Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Appeal Transcript]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sealed Transcript]
  • March 20, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Variance]
November, 2024
  • November 07, 2024: [Jury Verdict ]
  • November 06, 2024: [Jury Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 07, 2024: [Docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.