U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00275
  • Case Name: Sczurek v. Heights OKC Investments LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 02, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 18, 2025: [Leave]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • October 07, 2024: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.