U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00259-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Caldwell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver (other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2024: [Docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.