U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • May 02, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Amended Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certificate 18 USC 3006]
  • April 18, 2025: [Jury Verdict ]
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Court Jury Instructions]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Acquittal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 15, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 13, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [Oath of Interpreter]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Interpreter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 05, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Objections]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 26, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 23, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sever Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
January, 2025
  • January 26, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2024
  • December 14, 2024: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 27, 2024: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 24, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 09, 2024: [Information - Felony]
  • October 09, 2024: [Seal Document]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Docket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.