U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01051
  • Case Name: Performance Proppants LLC v. Chesapeake Operating LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 17, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 08, 2024: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 08, 2024: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2024: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 08, 2024: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.