U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01050
  • Case Name: Rich v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • April 18, 2025: [Remand to Agency]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 08, 2024: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.