U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00976
  • Case Name: Albright v. GEO Group Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 01, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • April 21, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 16, 2025: [Produce]
  • April 11, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Objections]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 09, 2024: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 08, 2024: [Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.