U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Continental Carbon Company v. Daltec Canadian Buffalo Manufacturing Ltd
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 17, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Protective Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.