U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-mj-00522-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Lusz
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Request for Modifying Conditions of Supervision (12B)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [In Chambers Conference]
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision and Order (12C)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Violation Report - Post Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision and Order (12C)]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.