U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00671
  • Case Name: Cole v. Department of Veteran Affairs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Leave]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 10, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 09, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.