U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00619
  • Case Name: XPT Partners LLC v. Trisura Specialty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Amended Counterclaim]
  • April 01, 2025: [Docket]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Counterclaim (Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.