U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00342
  • Case Name: Private Jets Inc v. QBE Insurance Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
  • March 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
  • March 13, 2025: [Witness List]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.