U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00398-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 25, 2025: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 26, 2025: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2024: [DPPA-Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 11, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 11, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.