U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00114
  • Case Name: Neal v. Oklahoma County Criminal Justice Authority et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Docket]
  • March 14, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 10, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 10, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 10, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Set Aside Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.