U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00544
  • Case Name: Kristich v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Discovery]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 11, 2024: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.