U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00550
  • Case Name: Coulter v. Gomez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • April 16, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Mail Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 31, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Address Change]
  • March 31, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 28, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2024: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.