U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00743
  • Case Name: Parker v. Hartman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 17, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 07, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 03, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.