U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00602
  • Case Name: Vision Bank v. Avery et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 09, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Witness List]
  • March 26, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 26, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
  • March 19, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.