U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cv-00641
  • Case Name: McGinnis v. Nationwide Life and Annuity Insurance Co et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Compel]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.