U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acosta et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 14, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.