U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00451
  • Case Name: Owens et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 15, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 15, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
  • April 01, 2025: [Witness List - Expert]
October, 2024
  • October 16, 2024: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 14, 2024: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.