U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00436-8
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [DPPA-Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
  • March 12, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release and Order (PS-8)]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.