U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-01090
  • Case Name: Coshow v. PF Crystal Park SNF OPS LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Lifting Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stay Case]
  • March 11, 2025: [Suggestion of Death]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: [Notice from the Court]
October, 2024
  • October 18, 2024: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.