U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00450-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 10, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Jury Trial]
  • April 04, 2025: [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 28, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sever Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 27, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 25, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Use 404b Evidence]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2025: [James Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Exhibits]
  • March 19, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 16, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 14, 2025: [Joint Discovery Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss Counts]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.